Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB703 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 703


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of a certified copy of a birth certificate
 for certain minors receiving services from the Department of Family
 and Protective Services and to the amendment of birth and death
 certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 191.0047, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (b) The Department of State Health Services shall enter into
 a memorandum of understanding with the Department of Family and
 Protective Services to implement this section. Subject to
 Subsection (c), the [The] terms of the memorandum of understanding
 must include methods for reimbursing the Department of State Health
 Services in an amount that is not more than the actual costs the
 department incurs in verifying the birth information or providing
 the birth record to the Department of Family and Protective
 Services.
 (c)  The Department of State Health Services may not collect
 a fee or other amount for verification of birth information or
 provision of a certified copy of the birth record under Subsection
 (a) for a child in the managing conservatorship of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services if parental rights to the child have
 been terminated and the child is eligible for adoption.
 SECTION 2. Section 191.028, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than the 30th business day after the date the
 department receives an amending certificate, the department shall
 notify the individual of whether the amendment has been accepted
 for filing.
 SECTION 3. This Act applies only to amending certificates
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act. Amending
 certificates filed before the effective date of this Act are
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 703 passed the Senate on
 March 19, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 703 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor