Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB705 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 11, 2009      TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB705 by Nelson (Relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB 705, As Introduced: a positive impact of $430,771 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 81ST LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 11, 2009





  TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services      FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB705 by Nelson (Relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services
FROM: John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB705 by Nelson (Relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.), As Introduced

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 Honorable Jane Nelson, Chair, Senate Committee on Health & Human Services 

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S. O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB705 by Nelson (Relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.), As Introduced

SB705 by Nelson (Relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB 705, As Introduced: a positive impact of $430,771 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB 705, As Introduced: a positive impact of $430,771 through the biennium ending August 31, 2011.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2010 $206,021   2011 $224,750   2012 $224,750   2013 $224,750   2014 $224,750    


2010 $206,021
2011 $224,750
2012 $224,750
2013 $224,750
2014 $224,750

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $206,021 $206,021 (7.0)   2011 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2012 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2013 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2014 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds555  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2009   2010 $206,021 $206,021 (7.0)   2011 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2012 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2013 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)   2014 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)  


2010 $206,021 $206,021 (7.0)
2011 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)
2012 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)
2013 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)
2014 $224,750 $224,750 (7.0)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would implement recommendations in the report, "Eliminate the Medicaid Consolidated Waiver Program and Transfer Clients to Other Existing Programs," in the LBB Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report submitted to the Eighty-First Texas Legislature, 2009. The bill would amend Subchapter D of the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), in consultation with the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), to streamline the administration and delivery of services provided through Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.     The bill would abolish the Consolidated Waiver Program under Section 531.0219 of the Government Code effective September 15, 2009.  No later than September 14, 2009, DADS, with assistance from HHSC, is required to determine the Medicaid long-term care waiver program that Consolidated Waiver Program clients are eligible for and transfer these clients without any break in service from the Consolidated Waiver Program to an appropriate Medicaid long-term care waiver program. The bill would be effective immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote of each house; otherwise, the bill would be effective September 1, 2009.

The bill would implement recommendations in the report, "Eliminate the Medicaid Consolidated Waiver Program and Transfer Clients to Other Existing Programs," in the LBB Government Effectiveness and Efficiency Report submitted to the Eighty-First Texas Legislature, 2009.

The bill would amend Subchapter D of the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Aging and Disability Services (DADS), in consultation with the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), to streamline the administration and delivery of services provided through Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.    

The bill would abolish the Consolidated Waiver Program under Section 531.0219 of the Government Code effective September 15, 2009.  No later than September 14, 2009, DADS, with assistance from HHSC, is required to determine the Medicaid long-term care waiver program that Consolidated Waiver Program clients are eligible for and transfer these clients without any break in service from the Consolidated Waiver Program to an appropriate Medicaid long-term care waiver program.

The bill would be effective immediately if it receives a two-thirds vote of each house; otherwise, the bill would be effective September 1, 2009.

Methodology

The bill would result in a savings of $412,042 in All Funds in fiscal year 2010 and a savings of $449,500 in All Funds per year in fiscal years 2011 through 2014.  These savings include $334,355 in salary and benefits for 7 Full-Time Equivalents, $3,667 for travel expenses, and $74,020 in other operating expenses in fiscal year 2010, and $364,751 in salary and benefits for 7 Full-Time Equivalents, $4,000 for travel expenses, and $80,749 for other operating expenses for fiscal years 2011 through 2014.  

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 539 Aging and Disability Services, Department of

LBB Staff: JOB, CL, JI, DM

 JOB, CL, JI, DM