Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB705 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 705
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2009; February 25, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Medicaid consolidated waiver program and other
 Medicaid long-term care waiver programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 161.077 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.077.  LONG-TERM CARE MEDICAID WAIVER PROGRAMS.
 (a)  In this section, "Section 1915(c) waiver program" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
 (b)  The department, in consultation with the commission,
 shall streamline the administration of and delivery of services
 through Section 1915(c) waiver programs. In implementing this
 subsection, the department, subject to Subsection (c), may consider
 implementing the following streamlining initiatives:
 (1)  reducing the number of forms used in administering
 the programs;
 (2)  revising program provider manuals and training
 curricula;
 (3) consolidating service authorization systems;
 (4)  eliminating any physician signature requirements
 the department considers unnecessary;
 (5)  standardizing individual service plan processes
 across the programs; and
 (6)  any other initiatives that will increase
 efficiencies in the programs.
 (c)  The department shall ensure that actions taken under
 this section do not conflict with any requirements of the
 commission under Section 531.0218, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. Effective September 15, 2009, Section 531.02191,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02191. PUBLIC INPUT. In complying with the
 requirements of Section [Sections] 531.0218 [and 531.0219], the
 commission shall regularly consult with and obtain input from:
 (1) consumers and family members;
 (2) providers;
 (3) advocacy groups;
 (4) state agencies that administer a Section 1915(c)
 waiver program; and
 (5) other interested persons.
 SECTION 3. (a) Effective September 15, 2009, Section
 531.0219, Government Code, is repealed.
 (b) Effective September 15, 2009, the consolidated waiver
 program under Section 531.0219, Government Code, is abolished. The
 Department of Aging and Disability Services, with the assistance of
 the Health and Human Services Commission, shall:
 (1) before September 14, 2009, determine in which
 other Section 1915(c) waiver programs, as defined by Section
 531.001, Government Code, each person receiving services through
 the consolidated waiver program is eligible for enrollment; and
 (2) not later than September 14, 2009, transfer the
 person's enrollment without any break in service from the
 consolidated waiver program to an appropriate program described by
 Subdivision (1) of this subsection for which the person is
 eligible.
 (c) A person described by Subsection (b) of this section may
 not be placed on an interest list or any other waiting list for a
 Section 1915(c) waiver program instead of being enrolled in a
 program as required by Subdivision (2), Subsection (b) of this
 section.
 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *