Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB705 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    81R34933 KLA-F
 By: Nelson S.B. No. 705
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 705:
 By: McReynolds C.S.S.B. No. 705


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to long-term care consumer information and Medicaid waiver
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 161.077 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.077.  LONG-TERM CARE MEDICAID WAIVER PROGRAMS.
 (a)  In this section, "Section 1915(c) waiver program" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 531.001, Government Code.
 (b)  The department, in consultation with the commission,
 shall streamline the administration of and delivery of services
 through Section 1915(c) waiver programs. In implementing this
 subsection, the department, subject to Subsection (c), may consider
 implementing the following streamlining initiatives:
 (1)  reducing the number of forms used in administering
 the programs;
 (2)  revising program provider manuals and training
 curricula;
 (3) consolidating service authorization systems;
 (4)  eliminating any physician signature requirements
 the department considers unnecessary;
 (5)  standardizing individual service plan processes
 across the programs; and
 (6)  any other initiatives that will increase
 efficiencies in the programs.
 (c)  The department shall ensure that actions taken under
 this section do not conflict with any requirements of the
 commission under Section 531.0218, Government Code.
 SECTION 2. Effective September 15, 2009, Section 531.02191,
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02191. PUBLIC INPUT. In complying with the
 requirements of Section [Sections] 531.0218 [and 531.0219], the
 commission shall regularly consult with and obtain input from:
 (1) consumers and family members;
 (2) providers;
 (3) advocacy groups;
 (4) state agencies that administer a Section 1915(c)
 waiver program; and
 (5) other interested persons.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0318 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0318.  LONG-TERM CARE CONSUMER INFORMATION MADE
 AVAILABLE THROUGH THE INTERNET.  (a)  The Internet site maintained
 under Section 531.0317 must include information for consumers
 concerning long-term care services that complies with this section.
 The Internet site maintained by the Department of Aging and
 Disability Services must also include, or provide a link to, the
 information required by this section.
 (b)  The information for consumers required by this section
 must:
 (1)  be presented in a manner that is easily accessible
 to, and understandable by, a consumer; and
 (2)  allow a consumer to make informed choices
 concerning long-term care services and include:
 (A)  an explanation of the manner in which
 long-term care service delivery is administered in different
 counties through different programs operated by the commission and
 by the Department of Aging and Disability Services, so that an
 individual can easily understand the service options available in
 the area in which that individual lives; and
 (B)  for the Medicaid Star + Plus pilot program,
 information that allows a consumer to evaluate the performance of
 each participating plan issuer, including for each issuer, in an
 accessible format such as a table:
 (i) the enrollment in each county;
 (ii)  additional "value-added" services
 provided;
 (iii)  a summary of the financial
 statistical report required under Subchapter A, Chapter 533;
 (iv) complaint information;
 (v)  any sanction or penalty imposed by any
 state agency, including a sanction or penalty imposed by the
 commission or the Texas Department of Insurance;
 (vi)  information concerning consumer
 satisfaction; and
 (vii)  other data, including relevant data
 from reports of external quality review organizations, that may be
 used by the consumer to evaluate the quality of the services
 provided.
 (c)  In addition to providing the information required by
 this section through the Internet, the commission or the Department
 of Aging and Disability Services shall, on request by a consumer
 without Internet access, provide the consumer with a printed copy
 of the information from the website.  The commission or department
 may charge a reasonable fee for printing the information.
 SECTION 4. (a) Effective September 15, 2009, Section
 531.0219, Government Code, is repealed.
 (b) Subject to Section 7 of this Act:
 (1) effective September 15, 2009, the consolidated
 waiver program under Section 531.0219, Government Code, is
 abolished; and
 (2) the Department of Aging and Disability Services,
 with the assistance of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 shall:
 (A) before September 14, 2009, determine in which
 other Section 1915(c) waiver programs, as defined by Section
 531.001, Government Code, each person receiving services through
 the consolidated waiver program is eligible for enrollment; and
 (B) not later than September 14, 2009, transfer
 the person's enrollment without any break in service from the
 consolidated waiver program to an appropriate program described by
 Paragraph (A) of this subdivision for which the person is eligible.
 (c) A person described by Subsection (b) of this section may
 not be placed on an interest list or any other waiting list for a
 Section 1915(c) waiver program instead of being enrolled in a
 program as required by Paragraph (B), Subdivision (2), Subsection
 (b), of this section.
 SECTION 5. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall make the information required
 by Section 531.0318, Government Code, as added by this Act,
 available through the Internet.
 (b) In developing the information required to be made
 available under this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall incorporate long-term care provider quality information
 reported through the Department of Aging and Disability Services
 Internet site, as well as other appropriate available information
 concerning the quality of services provided through the long-term
 care service delivery programs operated by that department.
 SECTION 6. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 7. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that the implementation of the provision
 could result in a reduction or elimination of federal funding, the
 agency affected by the provision may delay implementing that
 provision, including by continuing to operate the consolidated
 waiver program otherwise eliminated by this Act, until the agency
 is notified by the federal government that the implementation will
 not result in a reduction or elimination of federal funding.
 SECTION 8. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.