E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4208
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3929
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4093
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3299
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4845
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1211
|
Journal Page: 4845
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4845
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4845
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4349
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1179
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 756
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 342
|
Senate
|
02/24/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
Senate
|
02/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|