House | 05/13/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1869 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1393 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 343 | |
Senate | 02/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 343 | |
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |