E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR81
|
Journal Page: 6963
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 81
|
Journal Page: 5108
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1633
|
Journal Page: 6272
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6271
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2967
|
Journal Page: 6270
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1097
|
Journal Page: 5024
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4897
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5825
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5825
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4196
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4129
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 5082
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Bolton
|
Journal Page: 5077
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5073
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/27/09 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 5059
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2206
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1140
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|