E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4728
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4195
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5181
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1380
|
Journal Page: 5181
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5181
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3860
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2422
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2421
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#770
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Vaught
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
4-Laubenberg
|
Journal Page: 3101
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 4386
|
Journal Page: 3100
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1218
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1009
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 921
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 344
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|