House | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4301 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4220 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2613 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2613 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 2613 |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2613 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 2612 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA1 Watson | Journal Page: 2612 |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 2611 |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2611 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2611 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2598 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2598 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2596 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2365 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 188 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |