House
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1822
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1822
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1822
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1012
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 346
|
Senate
|
02/25/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 346
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|