E | 04/16/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/16/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1108 | |
E | 04/08/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1147 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 980 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1101 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#117 | Journal Page: 1101 |
House | 04/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1101 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1101 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1378 | Journal Page: 1076 |
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 711 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 711 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 711 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 400 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 400 | |
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 316 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |