E
|
05/13/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2395
|
E
|
05/06/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2064
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2040
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2040
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2040
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB1706
|
Journal Page: 2150
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1266
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1180
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1013
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 755
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 401
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|