By: Nelson S.B. No. 79 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2008; February 10, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; March 26, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 26, 2009, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 79 By: Ellis A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to specialty certification for insurance agents serving certain employer groups. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 4054, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subchapter H to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER H. SPECIALTY CERTIFICATION FOR AGENTS SERVING CERTAIN EMPLOYER GROUPS Sec. 4054.351. CERTIFICATION PROGRAM. The department shall establish a voluntary specialty certification program for individuals who market small employer health benefit plans in accordance with Chapter 1501. Sec. 4054.352. QUALIFICATIONS. (a) To be eligible to receive a specialty certification under this subchapter, an individual must: (1) hold a general life, accident, and health license under this chapter; (2) satisfy the requirements of this subchapter; and (3) submit evidence of completion of training to the department in the manner prescribed by the commissioner. (b) To maintain a specialty certification under this subchapter, an individual must continue to hold a general life, accident, and health license under this chapter. Sec. 4054.353. INITIAL TRAINING. (a) To be certified under this subchapter, an individual must first complete training in the law, including department rules, applicable to small employer health benefit plans offered under Chapter 1501. (b) An individual seeking specialty certification under this subchapter must complete a course applicable to small employer health benefit plans under Chapter 1501, as prescribed and approved by the commissioner. Except as provided by Subsection (c), an individual is not eligible for the specialty certification unless, on completion of the course, it is certified to the commissioner as required by the department that the individual has: (1) completed the course; and (2) passed an examination testing the individual's knowledge and qualification. (c) An individual seeking specialty certification under this subchapter is not required to complete the course and examination required by Subsection (b) if the individual demonstrates to the department, in the manner prescribed by the department, that the individual holds a designation as: (1) a Registered Health Underwriter (RHU); (2) a Certified Employee Benefit Specialist (CEBS); or (3) a Registered Employee Benefits Consultant (REBC). Sec. 4054.354. RENEWAL. To renew a specialty certification under this subchapter, the individual must complete five hours of continuing education applicable to small employer health benefit plans during the two-year certification period. Sec. 4054.355. SATISFACTION OF CONTINUING EDUCATION REQUIREMENTS. Each hour of education completed in accordance with this subchapter to obtain or renew a specialty license may be used to satisfy an hour of a continuing education requirement otherwise applicable to the agent under this title. Sec. 4054.356. OFFER OF SERVICES TO ALL GROUP SIZES. To hold a specialty certification under this subchapter, an individual must agree to market small employer health benefit plans to small employers that satisfy the requirements of Chapter 1501 without regard to the number of employees to be covered under the plan. Sec. 4054.357. ADVERTISING. An individual who holds a specialty certification may advertise, in the manner specified by department rule, that the individual is specially trained to serve small employers. Sec. 4054.358. LIST MAINTAINED BY DEPARTMENT; WEBSITE. The department shall maintain a list of all individuals who hold a specialty certification under this subchapter, together with the business address and phone number of each individual and a general description of the individual's service area. The department shall publish the list on the department website. Sec. 4054.359. RULES. The commissioner, in accordance with Section 36.001, may adopt rules as necessary to administer this subchapter. SECTION 2. Section 4001.002, Insurance Code, is amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: (a-1) Except as otherwise provided by this code, this title applies to each individual who holds a specialty certification under Subchapter H, Chapter 4054. SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2010, the Texas Department of Insurance may begin issuing specialty certifications under Subchapter H, Chapter 4054, Insurance Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *