House | 05/22/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4078 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1123 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 889 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 403 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 403 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |