Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB80 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 80


 AN ACT
 relating to employer contributions under small employer health
 benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1501.153, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a small employer
 health benefit plan issuer may offer a small employer the option of
 a small employer health benefit plan for which the employer is
 required to contribute 100 percent of the premium paid. A plan
 offered under this subsection may be offered in addition to a plan
 offered by the issuer in accordance with Subsection (a) that
 requires a lower percentage of the premium paid to be contributed by
 the employer. A plan issued under this subsection must require the
 employer to contribute 100 percent of the premium paid for each
 eligible participating employee.
 SECTION 2. This Act applies only to a small employer health
 benefit plan delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after
 January 1, 2010. A small employer health benefit plan delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2010, is governed
 by the law as it existed immediately before the effective date of
 this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 80 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 80 passed the House on
 May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor