Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB802 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carona S.B. No. 802
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2009; March 4, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 20, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 20, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 802 By: Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirements for a plumber's apprentice to obtain a
 plumber's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1301.354, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e)
 to read as follows:
 (b) A person who has worked as a plumber's apprentice for a
 period established by law or board rule may apply to [for and] take
 an examination for a license as a journeyman plumber or tradesman
 plumber-limited license holder. Before the applicant may take the
 examination, the applicant must complete classroom training
 provided by a board-approved instructor in a board-approved
 training program in the areas of health and safety, applicable
 plumbing codes, and water conservation for at least:
 (1)  24 hours if the applicant is applying to take a
 tradesman plumber-limited license holder examination; or
 (2)  48 hours if the applicant is applying to take a
 journeyman plumber examination.
 (c)  At the applicant's request, the board may credit an
 applicant under Subsection (b) with up to 500 hours of the work
 experience required before taking an examination if the applicant
 has completed the classroom portion of a training program:
 (1)  approved by the United States Department of Labor,
 Office of Apprenticeship;  or
 (2)  provided by a person approved by the board and
 based on course materials approved by the board.
 (d)  Notwithstanding the classroom training required by
 Subsection (b), a plumber's apprentice may apply for and take an
 examination for a license as a journeyman plumber or tradesman
 plumber-limited license holder if the apprentice has received an
 associate of applied science degree from a plumbing technology
 program that:
 (1)  includes a combination of classroom and on-the-job
 training;  and
 (2)  is approved by the board and the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a plumber's apprentice
 who is enrolled in good standing in a training program approved by
 the United States Department of Labor, Office of Apprenticeship,
 may take an examination without completing the classroom training
 required by Subsection (b)(1) or (2).
 SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application to take an examination submitted to the Texas State
 Board of Plumbing Examiners on or after the effective date of this
 Act. An application submitted before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the application is
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *