House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1868
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1567
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1092
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 736
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 404
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|