House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2673 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2088 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 2087 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Davis | Journal Page: 2085 |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2085 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2085 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2052 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1940 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1780 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1711 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 404 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |