House | 04/28/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1354 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1255 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ogden | Journal Page: 1255 |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1255 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1255 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1110 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1107 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 404 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
Senate | 02/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |