E | 05/23/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 05/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2395 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3673 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2370 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2395 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2316 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3214 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3205 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3205 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB554 | Journal Page: 3205 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1013 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 736 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 618 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 405 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 405 | |
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |