E
|
05/20/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
E
|
05/12/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3207
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2235
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#622
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 1869
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1205
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
Senate
|
02/12/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|