E | 05/12/2009 | Effective on 1/1/10 | ||
E | 05/12/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2308 | |
E | 05/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1936 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2296 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1884 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Record vote | RV#412 | Journal Page: 2170 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB2577 | Journal Page: 2151 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2216 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1066 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 841 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 776 | |
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |