House | 05/25/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2671 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2140 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1940 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1936 | |
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 702 | |
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 584 | |
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/13/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 472 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |