House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3953
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1270
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1141
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
Senate
|
04/16/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 407
|
Senate
|
02/13/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|