House | 05/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4315 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3038 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2869 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2124 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1055 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 407 | |
Senate | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 407 | |
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |