Senate | 05/11/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Postponed | 05/08/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2129 |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2129 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2129 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2129 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |