House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2430 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1912 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1912 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1912 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1912 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 02/16/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |