House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1011 | |
House | 03/19/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 602 | |
Senate | 03/19/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/03/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 363 | |
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |