E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4994
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5980
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4512
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4163
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4163
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4163
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4155
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2683
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1048
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4258
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1028
|
Journal Page: 4156
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
13-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4156
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
14-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4156
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
13-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 4153
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amended
|
12-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 4152
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
5-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 4143
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 3; Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1); and Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3); Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4138
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/20/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 3 and Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4059
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2132
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1764
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1055
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
02/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|