E
|
05/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
E
|
05/11/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2197
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2226
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3039
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2164
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2162
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#558
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#536
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Menendez
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1303
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 980
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 913
|
Senate
|
04/07/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 838
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 645
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
02/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|