Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB873 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 873


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that certain appraisal districts provide
 for electronic filing of and electronic communications regarding a
 protest of appraised value by the owner of a residence homestead.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 41, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 41.415 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.415.  ELECTRONIC FILING OF NOTICE OF PROTEST.
 (a)  This section applies only to an appraisal district that:
 (1)  on January 1, 2008, maintained an Internet website
 accessible to the public; or
 (2)  after that date established or establishes such an
 Internet website.
 (b)  Each appraisal district shall implement a system that
 allows the owner of a property that for the current tax year has
 been granted a residence homestead exemption under Section 11.13,
 in connection with the property, to electronically:
 (1)  file a notice of protest under Section 41.41(a)(1)
 or (2) with the appraisal review board;
 (2)  receive and review comparable sales data and other
 evidence that the chief appraiser intends to use at the protest
 hearing before the board;
 (3) receive, as applicable:
 (A)  a settlement offer from the district to
 correct the appraisal records by changing the market value and, if
 applicable, the appraised value of the property to the value as
 redetermined by the district; or
 (B)  a notice from the district that a settlement
 offer will not be made; and
 (4)  accept or reject a settlement offer received from
 the appraisal district under Subdivision (3)(A).
 (c)  With each notice sent under Section 25.19 to an eligible
 property owner, the chief appraiser shall include information about
 the system required by this section, including instructions for
 accessing and using the system.
 (d)  A notice of protest filed electronically under this
 section must include, at a minimum:
 (1)  a statement as to whether the protest is brought
 under Section 41.41(a)(1) or under Section 41.41(a)(2);
 (2)  a statement of the property owner's good faith
 estimate of the value of the property; and
 (3)  an electronic mail address that the district may
 use to communicate electronically with the property owner in
 connection with the protest.
 (e)  If the property owner accepts a settlement offer made by
 the appraisal district, the chief appraiser shall enter the
 settlement in the appraisal records as an agreement made under
 Section 1.111(e).
 (f)  If the property owner rejects a settlement offer, the
 appraisal review board shall hear and determine the property
 owner's protest in the manner otherwise provided by this subchapter
 and Subchapter D.
 (g)  An appraisal district is not required to make the system
 required by this section available to an owner of a residence
 homestead located in an area in which the chief appraiser
 determines that the factors affecting the market value of real
 property are unusually complex.
 (h)  An electronic mail address provided by a property owner
 to an appraisal district under Subsection (d)(3) is confidential
 and may not be disclosed by the district.
 (i)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), an appraisal district
 established for a county having a population of 250,000 or less is
 not required to implement the system required by this section
 before January 1, 2013. This subsection expires January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 2. Section 41.415, Tax Code, as added by this Act,
 applies only to a tax year that begins on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 873 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 873 passed the House on
 May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor