Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB879 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Averitt, Duncan S.B. No. 879
22 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
44 April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
55 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 6, 2009,
66 sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 879 By: Van de Putte
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to premium discounts for certain participants in the Texas
1313 Health Insurance Risk Pool and to related tax credits for health
1414 benefit plan issuers.
1515 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1616 SECTION 1. Section 1506.105, Insurance Code, is amended by
1717 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (e-1) and (e-2) to
1818 read as follows:
1919 (e) Premium rates shall be established to provide fully for
2020 all of the expected costs of claims, including recovery of prior
2121 losses, expenses of operation, investment income from claim
2222 reserves, and any other cost factors, subject to the limitations
2323 [limitation] described in this subsection and Subsection (e-1). In
2424 no event may pool premium rates exceed 200 percent of the standard
2525 risk rate described by Subsection (d) [rates applicable to
2626 individual standard risks].
2727 (e-1) Subject to Subsection (e-2), discounted premiums
2828 shall be offered on a sliding scale, based on financial need, as
2929 follows:
3030 (1) for an individual whose household income is below
3131 200 percent of the federal poverty measure, determined under the
3232 United States Department of Health and Human Services poverty
3333 guidelines in effect at the time coverage is provided, premium
3434 rates shall equal the standard risk rate described by Subsection
3535 (d); and
3636 (2) for an individual whose household income is at or
3737 below 300 percent, but not less than 200 percent, of the federal
3838 poverty measure, determined under the United States Department of
3939 Health and Human Services poverty guidelines in effect at the time
4040 coverage is provided, premium rates shall equal 140 percent of the
4141 standard risk rate described by Subsection (d).
4242 (e-2) The aggregate premium discount under Subsection
4343 (e-1), determined by subtracting the dollar amount of premiums
4444 collected under Subsection (e-1) from the dollar amount that would
4545 have been collected if a discount was not available under
4646 Subsection (e-1), may not exceed $20 million in any two-year
4747 period, beginning with the two-year period that begins January 1,
4848 2010, and ends December 31, 2011.
4949 SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, is
5050 amended by adding Section 1506.260 to read as follows:
5151 Sec. 1506.260. TAX CREDIT. (a) A health benefit plan
5252 issuer is entitled to a credit against the issuer's premium tax
5353 under Chapter 222 for premium discounts granted under Section
5454 1506.105(e-1). Each issuer's share of the premium discounts is
5555 based on the method described by Section 1506.253 as calculated by
5656 the pool.
5757 (b) The tax credit applies to the premium tax due in the
5858 calendar year following the calendar year in which the assessment
5959 is paid. An unused credit may be carried over to apply to the
6060 premium tax due in the five consecutive calendar years that follow
6161 the calendar year in which the credit may first be applied.
6262 (c) The balance of a tax credit not claimed in a particular
6363 calendar year may be reflected in the books and records of the
6464 issuer as an admitted asset of the issuer.
6565 (d) Available credit against premium tax allowed under this
6666 section may be transferred or assigned among health benefit plan
6767 issuers if:
6868 (1) a merger, acquisition, or total assumption of
6969 reinsurance among the issuers occurs; or
7070 (2) the commissioner by order approves the transfer or
7171 assignment.
7272 SECTION 3. (a) This Act applies only to premium rates for
7373 coverage through the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool under Chapter
7474 1506, Insurance Code, as amended by this Act, that is in effect on
7575 or after January 1, 2010. Premium rates for coverage in effect
7676 before January 1, 2010, are governed by the law in effect
7777 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
7878 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
7979 (b) A health benefit plan issuer may apply a tax credit
8080 under Section 1506.260, Insurance Code, as added by this Act,
8181 beginning with the first premium tax payment that is due on or after
8282 January 1, 2012.
8383 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
8484 * * * * *