Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB882 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 882


 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of a regional tollway authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 366.178, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (j) to read as follows:
 (j)  In addition to the other powers and duties provided by
 this chapter, an authority has the same powers and duties as the
 department under Chapter 228, a county under Chapter 284, and a
 regional mobility authority under Chapter 370, regarding the
 authority's toll collection and enforcement powers for:
 (1) the authority's turnpike projects; and
 (2)  other toll projects developed, financed,
 constructed, or operated under an agreement, including a
 comprehensive development agreement, with the authority.
 SECTION 2. Section 366.185, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d-2) to read as follows:
 (d-2)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d-1), if the contract
 amount exceeds $50 million, the rules adopted under Subsection (d)
 may provide for a stipend to be offered to an unsuccessful
 design-build firm that submits a response to the authority's
 request for additional information, in an amount that:
 (1) may exceed $250,000; and
 (2)  is reasonably necessary, as determined by the
 authority in its sole discretion, to compensate an unsuccessful
 firm for:
 (A)  preliminary engineering costs associated
 with the development of the proposal by the firm; and
 (B)  the value of the work product contained in
 the proposal, including the techniques, methods, processes, and
 information contained in the proposal.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (g), Section 366.407, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (g) Except as provided by this subsection, a comprehensive
 development agreement with a private participant that includes the
 collection by the private participant of tolls for the use of a toll
 project may be for a term not longer than 50 years from the later of
 the date of final acceptance of the project or the start of revenue
 operations by the private participant, not to exceed a total term of
 52 years. The contract must contain an explicit mechanism for
 setting the price for the purchase by the authority [department] of
 the interest of the private participant in the contract and related
 property, including any interest in a highway or other facility
 designed, developed, financed, constructed, operated, or
 maintained under the contract.
 SECTION 4. Sections 366.2521 and 366.2522, Transportation
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 882 passed the Senate on
 April 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 882 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor