Senate | 05/07/2009 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2052 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1763 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |