House | 05/22/2009 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | Journal Page: 4334 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2293 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2293 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1712 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1634 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1633 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1633 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 1633 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Patrick | Journal Page: 1632 |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1631 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1615 | |
Senate | 04/24/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1353 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1106 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 644 | |
Senate | 03/17/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 512 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2008 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |