Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB893 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 893
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 April 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 15, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 893 By: Nelson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a county to inspect day-care centers
 and group day-care homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 234, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C.  COUNTY INSPECTION OF DAY-CARE CENTERS AND GROUP
 DAY-CARE HOMES LOCATED IN MUNICIPALITIES
 Sec. 234.051. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Day-care center" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 42.002, Human Resources Code.
 (2)  "Group day-care home" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 42.002, Human Resources Code.
 Sec. 234.052.  APPLICABILITY.  This subchapter applies only
 to a county with a population of 700,000 or more.
 Sec. 234.053.  FACILITY INSPECTION REQUIRED BY
 MUNICIPALITY.  A county health officer or official designated by
 the commissioners court may contract with a municipality for the
 county to conduct an inspection required by the municipality of a
 day-care center or group day-care home located in the municipality.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *