E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5157 | |
E | 05/22/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2760 | |
House | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4350 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2732 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2759 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2638 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4119 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | RV#1011 | Journal Page: 4118 |
House | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 4118 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4118 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3041 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1869 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1611 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 04/21/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 03/02/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 352 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |