House | 05/19/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3939 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1596 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1569 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1118 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1118 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1118 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1117 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1117 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1117 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1117 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Shapleigh | Journal Page: 1115 |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1115 | |
Senate | 04/17/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1115 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |