Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB904 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 904


 AN ACT
 relating to the classification of and prescriptions issued for
 certain controlled substances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 481.074, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) and amending Subsection (k) to
 read as follows:
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d), a prescribing
 practitioner may issue multiple prescriptions authorizing the
 patient to receive a total of up to a 90-day supply of a Schedule II
 controlled substance if:
 (1)  each separate prescription is issued for a
 legitimate medical purpose by a prescribing practitioner acting in
 the usual course of professional practice;
 (2)  the prescribing practitioner provides written
 instructions on each prescription to be filled at a later date
 indicating the earliest date on which a pharmacy may fill each
 prescription;
 (3)  the prescribing practitioner concludes that
 providing the patient with multiple prescriptions in this manner
 does not create an undue risk of diversion or abuse; and
 (4)  the issuance of multiple prescriptions complies
 with other applicable state and federal laws.
 (k) A prescription for a controlled substance must show:
 (1) the quantity of the substance prescribed:
 (A) numerically, followed by the number written
 as a word, if the prescription is written; or
 (B) if the prescription is communicated orally or
 telephonically, as transcribed by the receiving pharmacist;
 (2) the date of issue;
 (2-a)  if the prescription is issued for a Schedule II
 controlled substance to be filled at a later date under Subsection
 (d-1), the earliest date on which a pharmacy may fill the
 prescription;
 (3) the name, address, and date of birth or age of the
 patient or, if the controlled substance is prescribed for an
 animal, the species of the animal and the name and address of its
 owner;
 (4) the name and strength of the controlled substance
 prescribed;
 (5) the directions for use of the controlled
 substance;
 (6) the intended use of the substance prescribed
 unless the practitioner determines the furnishing of this
 information is not in the best interest of the patient;
 (7) the legibly printed or stamped name, address,
 Federal Drug Enforcement Administration registration number, and
 telephone number of the practitioner at the practitioner's usual
 place of business;
 (8) if the prescription is handwritten, the signature
 of the prescribing practitioner; and
 (9) if the prescribing practitioner is licensed in
 this state, the practitioner's department registration number.
 SECTION 2. Subsection (e), Section 481.075, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (e) Each official prescription form used to prescribe a
 Schedule II controlled substance must contain:
 (1) information provided by the prescribing
 practitioner, including:
 (A) the date the prescription is written;
 (B) the controlled substance prescribed;
 (C) the quantity of controlled substance
 prescribed, shown numerically followed by the number written as a
 word;
 (D) the intended use of the controlled substance
 or the diagnosis for which it is prescribed and the instructions for
 use of the substance;
 (E) the practitioner's name, address, department
 registration number, and Federal Drug Enforcement Administration
 number; [and]
 (F) the name, address, and date of birth or age of
 the person for whom the controlled substance is prescribed; and
 (G)  if the prescription is issued to be filled at
 a later date under Section 481.074(d-1), the earliest date on which
 a pharmacy may fill the prescription;
 (2) information provided by the dispensing
 pharmacist, including the date the prescription is filled; and
 (3) the signatures of the prescribing practitioner and
 the dispensing pharmacist.
 SECTION 3. Subsection (c), Section 481.0761, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The director by rule may:
 (1) permit more than one prescription to be
 administered or dispensed and recorded on one prescription form for
 a Schedule III through V controlled substance;
 (1-a)  establish a procedure for the issuance of
 multiple prescriptions of a Schedule II controlled substance under
 Section 481.074(d-1);
 (2) remove from or return to the official prescription
 program any aspect of a practitioner's or pharmacist's hospital
 practice, including administering or dispensing;
 (3) waive or delay any requirement relating to the
 time or manner of reporting;
 (4) establish compatibility protocols for electronic
 data transfer hardware, software, or format;
 (5) establish a procedure to control the release of
 information under Sections 481.074, 481.075, and 481.076; and
 (6) establish a minimum level of prescription activity
 below which a reporting activity may be modified or deleted.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 481.037 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.037.  CARISOPRODOL.  Schedule IV includes
 carisoprodol.
 SECTION 5. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the issuance of a prescription on or after the effective date of
 this Act. The issuance of a prescription before the effective date
 of this Act is covered by the law in effect when the prescription
 was issued, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 904 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2009, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 904 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor