Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB909 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Willams S.B. No. 909
 (In the Senate - Filed February 17, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 April 8, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating the first week of October as Monarch
 Butterfly Week.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.153 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.153.  MONARCH BUTTERFLY WEEK.  (a)  The first seven
 days of October are Monarch Butterfly Week to encourage Texas
 residents and visitors to study, observe, and promote the life of
 the state insect, the monarch butterfly.
 (b)  Through participation in the Texas Monarch Watch
 program sponsored by the Parks and Wildlife Department, Texas
 residents and visitors may help scientists answer research
 questions about monarch biology and migration.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *