E
|
05/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
E
|
05/07/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2117
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2140
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2462
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2462
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2462
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2449
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1206
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 847
|
Senate
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|