Senate | 04/01/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 824 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 756 | |
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 584 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |