House | 05/21/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended | Rule 8, Section 5 | Journal Page: 3786 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2669 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2132 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1870 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1415 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1324 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1323 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1323 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Duncan | Journal Page: 1322 |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1322 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Amended | Journal Page: 1322 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/22/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |