E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5155
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6898
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4985
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6133
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4511
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4380
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4380
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4314
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2695
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#964
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Morrison
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3988
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#947
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 3907
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3905
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3301
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1011
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 761
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 599
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 541
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 540
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 540
|
Senate
|
03/17/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 540
|
Senate
|
03/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
01/26/2009
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2008
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|