E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5157
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5156
|
House
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5038
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4735
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1321
|
Journal Page: 4951
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4951
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4951
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Gonzalez Toureilles
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4612
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4286
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3038
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2869
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 433
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2009
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|