Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB959 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Duncan S.B. No. 959
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2009; March 9, 2009, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 30, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 30, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain counties to impose a hotel
 occupancy tax for the maintenance and operation of a coliseum in the
 county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The commissioners court of a county with a population of
 more than 16,000 that is bordered by Lake J. B. Thomas may impose a
 tax as provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. Section 352.003, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  The tax rate in a county authorized to impose the tax
 under Section 352.002(h) may not exceed four percent of the price
 paid for a room in a hotel.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 352, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 352.1036 to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.1036.  USE OF REVENUE: COUNTIES BORDERING LAKE
 J. B. THOMAS. The revenue from a tax imposed under this chapter by
 a county authorized to impose the tax under Section 352.002(h) may
 be used only to operate and maintain a coliseum in the county.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *