House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1267 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1267 | |
Senate | 04/15/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1016 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1013 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 949 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 949 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 949 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 949 | |
Senate | 04/08/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 924 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 902 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 899 | |
Senate | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 434 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 434 | |
Senate | 03/09/2009 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2009 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |