Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB961 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ellis, et al. S.B. No. 961
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 6, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 6, 2009,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 961 By: Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale of certain annuities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 102.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 102.002. QUALIFIED CHARITABLE GIFT ANNUITY. (a) A
 charitable gift annuity is a qualified charitable gift annuity for
 purposes of this chapter if it was issued before September 1, 1995,
 or if it is:
 (1) described by Section 501(m)(5), Internal Revenue
 Code of 1986; and
 (2) issued by a charitable organization that on the
 date of the annuity agreement:
 (A) has, exclusive of the assets funding the
 annuity agreement, a minimum of $100,000 in unrestricted cash, cash
 equivalents, or publicly traded securities; and
 (B) has been in continuous operation for at least
 three years or is a successor or affiliate of a charitable
 organization that has been in continuous operation for at least
 three years.
 (b)  The department may investigate as necessary to verify
 that an organization that issues an annuity meets the criteria
 described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2. Subsection (c), Section 102.102, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c) The charitable organization may not be required to
 submit additional information except to:
 (1)  aid the department in an investigation and
 verification of the organization conducted under Section
 102.002(b); and
 (2) determine appropriate penalties under Section
 102.104.
 SECTION 3. Section 1107.006, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1107.006. MATURITY DATE. [(a)] In determining the
 value of benefits under Sections 1107.102, 1107.103, and 1107.104,
 [and subject to Subsection (b), if an annuity contract permits an
 election to have annuity payments begin on optional maturity
 dates,] the maturity date is [considered to be the latest date on
 which an election is permitted by the contract.
 [(b)     A maturity date determined under this section may not
 be later than] the later of:
 (1) the next anniversary of the annuity contract that
 follows the annuitant's 70th birthday; or
 (2) the 10th anniversary of the contract.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter B, Chapter 4005, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 4005.056 to read as follows:
 Sec. 4005.056.  MODIFICATION OF METHOD OF COMPENSATION FOR
 SALE OF ANNUITIES. In addition to any other remedy available, the
 commissioner may order the modification of a method of compensation
 for the sale of an annuity that the commissioner finds, after notice
 and an opportunity for hearing, results in a pattern or practice
 that violates Chapter 1115.
 SECTION 5. This Act applies only to an annuity that is
 delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on or after January 1,
 2011. An annuity that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 before January 1, 2011, is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *