1 | 1 | | S.B. No. 968 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to interactive water features and fountains. |
---|
6 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 341, Health and Safety |
---|
8 | 8 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 341.0695 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 9 | | Sec. 341.0695. INTERACTIVE WATER FEATURES AND FOUNTAINS. |
---|
10 | 10 | | (a) In this section, "interactive water feature or fountain" means |
---|
11 | 11 | | an installation that includes water sprays, dancing water jets, |
---|
12 | 12 | | waterfalls, dumping buckets, or shooting water cannons and that is |
---|
13 | 13 | | maintained for public recreation. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) An owner, manager, operator, or other attendant in |
---|
15 | 15 | | charge of an interactive water feature or fountain shall maintain |
---|
16 | 16 | | the water feature or fountain in a sanitary condition. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (c) The bacterial content of the water in an interactive |
---|
18 | 18 | | water feature or fountain may not exceed the safe limits prescribed |
---|
19 | 19 | | by the standards adopted under this chapter. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (d) Except as provided by Subsection (f), a minimum free |
---|
21 | 21 | | residual chlorine of 1.0 part for each one million units of water |
---|
22 | 22 | | used in an interactive water feature or fountain must be |
---|
23 | 23 | | maintained. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (e) Water in an interactive water feature or fountain may |
---|
25 | 25 | | not show an acid reaction to a standard pH test. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (f) The department may by rule adopt methods other than |
---|
27 | 27 | | chlorination for the purpose of disinfecting interactive water |
---|
28 | 28 | | features and fountains. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (g) An interactive water feature or fountain that is |
---|
30 | 30 | | supplied entirely by drinking water that is not recirculated is not |
---|
31 | 31 | | subject to Subsections (d) and (e). |
---|
32 | 32 | | (h) A person known to be or suspected of being infected with |
---|
33 | 33 | | a transmissible condition of a communicable disease shall be |
---|
34 | 34 | | excluded from an interactive water feature or fountain. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (i) A county, a municipality, or the department may: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1) require that the owner or operator of an |
---|
37 | 37 | | interactive water feature or fountain obtain a permit for operation |
---|
38 | 38 | | of the water feature or fountain; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) inspect an interactive water feature or fountain |
---|
40 | 40 | | for compliance with this section; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (3) impose and collect a reasonable fee in connection |
---|
42 | 42 | | with a permit or inspection required under this subsection |
---|
43 | 43 | | provided, if the requirement is imposed by a county or |
---|
44 | 44 | | municipality, the following are met: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) the auditor for the county or municipality |
---|
46 | 46 | | shall review the program every two years to ensure that the fees |
---|
47 | 47 | | imposed do not exceed the cost of the program; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (B) the county or municipality refunds the permit |
---|
49 | 49 | | holders any revenue determined by the auditor to exceed the cost of |
---|
50 | 50 | | the program. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (j) A county, a municipality, or the department may by order |
---|
52 | 52 | | close, for the period specified in the order, an interactive water |
---|
53 | 53 | | feature or fountain if the operation of the fountain or water |
---|
54 | 54 | | feature violates this section or a permitting or inspection |
---|
55 | 55 | | requirement imposed under Subsection (i). |
---|
56 | 56 | | (k) This section does not apply to a recreational water park |
---|
57 | 57 | | that uses freshwater originating from a natural watercourse for |
---|
58 | 58 | | recreational purposes and releases the freshwater back into the |
---|
59 | 59 | | same natural watercourse. |
---|
60 | 60 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than the 30th day after the |
---|
61 | 61 | | effective date of this Act, the executive commissioner of the |
---|
62 | 62 | | Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt emergency rules in |
---|
63 | 63 | | accordance with Section 2001.034, Government Code, as necessary to |
---|
64 | 64 | | implement Section 341.0695, Health and Safety Code, as added by |
---|
65 | 65 | | this Act. |
---|
66 | 66 | | (b) An owner, manager, operator, or other attendant in |
---|
67 | 67 | | charge of an interactive water feature or fountain is not required |
---|
68 | 68 | | to comply with Section 341.0695, Health and Safety Code, as added by |
---|
69 | 69 | | this Act, before the fifth day after the date rules are adopted |
---|
70 | 70 | | under Subsection (a) of this section. |
---|
71 | 71 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
72 | 72 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
73 | 73 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
74 | 74 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
75 | 75 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
76 | 76 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
77 | 77 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
78 | 78 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 968 passed the Senate on |
---|
79 | 79 | | April 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
80 | 80 | | May 29, 2009, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
81 | 81 | | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 30, 2009, House |
---|
82 | 82 | | granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2009, Senate adopted |
---|
83 | 83 | | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
84 | 84 | | Nays 0. |
---|
85 | 85 | | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | 86 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
87 | 87 | | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 968 passed the House, with |
---|
88 | 88 | | amendments, on May 20, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 111, |
---|
89 | 89 | | Nays 34, two present not voting; May 30, 2009, House granted |
---|
90 | 90 | | request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
91 | 91 | | May 31, 2009, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
92 | 92 | | following vote: Yeas 124, Nays 21, one present not voting. |
---|
93 | 93 | | ______________________________ |
---|
94 | 94 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
95 | 95 | | Approved: |
---|
96 | 96 | | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | 97 | | Date |
---|
98 | 98 | | ______________________________ |
---|
99 | 99 | | Governor |
---|