Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB970 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 970
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2009; March 9, 2009,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 31, 2009, reported favorably by the
 following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; March 31, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications required of the executive director
 of the Texas Department of Transportation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 201.301, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commission shall elect an executive director for the
 department. The director must be [a registered professional
 engineer in this state and] experienced and skilled in
 transportation planning and[,] development[, construction,] and in
 organizational management [maintenance].
 SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to a person elected by the Texas Transportation Commission as
 the executive director of the Texas Department of Transportation on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act does not affect the
 right of the person serving as the executive director of the Texas
 Department of Transportation on the effective date of this Act to
 continue to serve as the executive director of that department.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *